EP0124456 - Device for placing, retracting or showing at least one flexible screen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 09.08.1989 [1989/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janin, Bernard 74 Cours de la Liberté F-69003 Lyon / FR | [1988/22] |
Former [1984/45] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC FILMS 25, quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grosjean, Pierre 14, rue Alexandre Berthier F-69110 Sainte-Foy-Les-Lyon / FR | 02 /
Janin, Bernard 74, cours Lafayette F-69003 Lyon / FR | [1984/45] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1988/22] |
Former [1986/32] | Rioufrays, Roger, et al RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie Centre de Recherches de Saint-Fons B.P. 62 F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1984/45] | Bouvy, Aline RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie Centre de Recherches de Saint-Fons B.P. 62 F-69192 Saint Fons Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 84420074.1 | 19.04.1984 | [1984/45] | Priority number, date | FR19830006983 | 25.04.1983 Original published format: FR 8306983 | [1984/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0124456 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0124456 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/22 | [1984/45] | CPC: |
A01G9/22 (EP);
Y02A40/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Anbringen, Zurückziehen oder Etablieren mindestens eines flexiblen Schirmes | [1984/45] | English: | Device for placing, retracting or showing at least one flexible screen | [1984/45] | French: | Dispositif pour la mise en place, le retrait ou l'établissement d'au moins un écran souple | [1984/45] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/27] | 28.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 19.04.1988 | CH | 30.04.1988 | LI | 30.04.1988 | [1989/32] |
Former [1989/27] | CH | 30.04.1988 | |
LI | 30.04.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1215429 (WILHELM GABLER GEWAECHSHAUSBAU, et al); | [Y]DE3013717 (GERHARDS BERNHARD); | [A]FR1586497 |