EP0148709 - Improved germicide composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.1988 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAPETROL INTERNATIONAL, INC. 3500 West Robinson St Suite 204 Norman Oklahoma 73070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | For all designated states CAPETROL INTERNATIONAL, INC. 3500 West Robinson St Suite 204 Norman Oklahoma 73070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia, Silverio M. 2416 Osborne Drive Norman Oklahoma 73069 / US | [1985/29] | Representative(s) | Laurent, Michel Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 F-69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | [1985/29] | Application number, filing date | 84420082.4 | 04.05.1984 | [1985/29] | Priority number, date | US19840569191 | 09.01.1984 Original published format: US 569191 | [1985/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0148709 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/42, A01N59/26, // (A61K33/42, 33:00, 31:19) | [1985/29] | CPC: |
A01N59/26 (EP);
A61K33/42 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/26, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/42, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/42, A61K33/00, A61K31/19 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/29] | Title | German: | Keimtötende Zusammensetzung | [1985/29] | English: | Improved germicide composition | [1985/29] | French: | Composition germicide | [1985/29] | File destroyed: | 09.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 22.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/07] | 01.12.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/25] | 13.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1988/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP7612390 ; | [A]FR1169512 (MONSANTO CHEMICALS); | [A]DE2349058 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH); | [A]FR901397 (MADAUS & CO DR); | [A]FR1003546 (I G FARBENINDUSTRIE AG EN LIQU) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 85, no. 4, 26th July 1976, page 94, no. 23059v, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP - A - 76 12390 (K. TAKADA et al.) 30-01-1976, & JP7612390 A 00000000 |