EP0132209 - Device for taking samples and for measuring flow of a liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/04] | Device for taking samples and for measuring flow | ||
[1987/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1988 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Savoyet, Jean-Louis Paul Jules La Mayrie F-38770 La Motte d'Aveillans / FR | [1985/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Robert A.M., et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/32] | Kremer, Robert A.M., et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/06] | Moinas, Michel Cabinet Michel Moinas 13 Chemin du Levant F-01210 Ferney-Voltaire / FR | ||
Former [1985/04] | Moinas, Michel c/o Cabinet Michel Moinas 13, Chemin du Levant F-01210 Ferney-Voltaire / FR | Application number, filing date | 84420107.9 | 22.06.1984 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | FR19830011121 | 30.06.1983 Original published format: FR 8311121 | [1985/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0132209 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132209 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A01J7/00, G01F5/00, G01N1/20, G01N23/22 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
A01J5/01 (EP,US);
G01F23/22 (EP,US);
G01F23/24 (EP,US);
G01F23/263 (EP,US);
G01F5/00 (EP,US);
G01N1/2035 (EP,US);
G01N33/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Probennahme und Durchflussmessung einer Flüssigkeit | [1987/18] | English: | Device for taking samples and for measuring flow of a liquid | [1987/18] | French: | Dispositif pour le prélèvement et la mesure du débit d'un liquide | [1985/04] |
Former [1985/04] | Vorrichtung zur Probenname und Durchflussmessung einer Flüssigkeit | ||
Former [1985/04] | Device for taking samples and for measuring flow | Examination procedure | 15.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/36] | 15.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3045493 (LESLIE SEABORNE THOMAS, et al); | [D]FR1424746 ; | [A]DE1247048 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]GB1095708 (HARTSTONE JOHN LEWIS); | [A]GB1139460 (SEABORNE THOMAS LESLIE); | [A]DE2932246 (SACHS SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH); | [A]GB2072624 (JOHNSON MATTHEY CO LTD); | [X]EP0057816 (HOEFELMAYR & CO [CH]) |