EP0133147 - Portable winding device for sheet-like documents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIBU DIFFUSION 11, rue de Rumilly F-74000 Annecy / FR | [1985/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pissettaz, Jean-François 1 bis, rue Jean Mermoz F-74000 Annecy-Le-Vieux / FR | [1985/07] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel Cabinet Poncet 7, chemin de Tillier B.P. 317 74008 Annecy Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/25] | de Beaumont, Michel Cabinet Poncet 7, chemin de Tillier B.P. 317 F-74008 Annecy Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1985/07] | de Beaumont, Michel Cabinet Poncet B.P. 317 F-74008 Annecy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 84420131.9 | 31.07.1984 | [1985/07] | Priority number, date | FR19830012925 | 01.08.1983 Original published format: FR 8312925 | [1985/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0133147 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0133147 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B42D19/00 | [1985/07] | CPC: |
B42D19/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1985/07] | Title | German: | Tragbarer Aufwickler für bogenförmige Dokumente | [1985/07] | English: | Portable winding device for sheet-like documents | [1985/07] | French: | Enrouleur portatif pour documents en forme de feuilles | [1985/07] | File destroyed: | 01.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 27.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/49] | 27.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/27] | 05.02.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1986 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH139022 ; | [Y]FR2082446 ; | [Y]US3259401 ; | [A]FR355469 ; | [Y]DE3124074 ; | [Y]FR2518498 ; | [A]BE671810 |