EP0146480 - Valve head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.1987 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissements MINGORI 141, rue Rambuteau F-71000 Macon / FR | [1985/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourbon, Georges Alain 11, Parc Grand Soleil F-69300 Caluire / FR | [1985/26] | Representative(s) | Karmin, Roger Cabinet MONNIER, 142-150, Cours Lafayette, B.P. 3058 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | [1985/26] | Application number, filing date | 84420191.3 | 09.11.1984 | [1985/26] | Priority number, date | FR19830018161 | 10.11.1983 Original published format: FR 8318161 | [1985/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0146480 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/08, F16K27/04 | [1985/26] | CPC: |
F16K27/045 (EP);
F16K3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/26] | Title | German: | Ventilkopf | [1985/26] | English: | Valve head | [1985/26] | French: | Tête de robinet perfectionée | [1985/26] | File destroyed: | 01.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 11.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/04] | 27.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/52] | 24.07.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2495266 ; | [A]DE3145863 ; | [A]EP0071779 ; | [A]FR2475680 ; | [A]FR2485682 ; | [A]CH204325 |