EP0120803 - A fiber reinforced/epoxy matrix composite helicopter rotor main hub plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.1988 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1988 [1988/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wehnert, George Joseph 28 Glenn Road Madison Connecticut 06443 / US | 02 /
Byrnes, Francis E., Jr. 3 Robinhood Road White Plains New York 10605 / US | 03 /
Ogle, Peter Chase Old Quarry Road Woodbridge Connecticut 06525 / US | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 84630034.1 | 07.03.1984 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | US19830477696 | 22.03.1983 Original published format: US 477696 | [1984/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0120803 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0120803 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120803 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/32 | [1984/40] | CPC: |
B64C27/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/40] | Title | German: | Eine epoxidharzfaserverstärkte, geschichtete Hauptnabenplatte für einen Hubschrauberrotor | [1984/40] | English: | A fiber reinforced/epoxy matrix composite helicopter rotor main hub plate | [1984/40] | French: | Plateau de moyeu principal en matériau composite à matrice en époxy, renforcé de fibres pour rotor d'hélicoptère | [1984/40] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/46] | 21.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2454963 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]); | [A]GB2033861 (TEXTRON INC); | [AP]GB2116505 (AGUSTA AERONAUT COSTR); | [AD]GB2092541 (AGUSTA AERONAUT COSTR) |