EP0163797 - Self-contained fan clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HORTON Industries, Inc. 1170 - 15th Avenue Southeast Minneapolis Minnesota 55414 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states HORTON Industries, Inc. 1170 - 15th Avenue Southeast Minneapolis Minnesota 55414 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanks, James V. 3308 Indiana Avenue North Roobinsdale Minnesota 55422 / US | 02 /
Dayen, Leonid 3505 Pilgrim Avenue Plymouth Minnesota 55441 / US | [1985/50] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 84630089.5 | 05.06.1984 | [1985/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0163797 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163797 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16D43/25, F16D43/28, F01P7/08 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
F16D43/25 (EP,US);
F16D43/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/50] | Title | German: | Selbständige Lüfterkupplung | [1985/50] | English: | Self-contained fan clutch | [1985/50] | French: | Embrayage autonome pour ventilateur | [1985/50] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/50] | 09.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 10.08.1988 | FR | 10.08.1988 | IT | 10.08.1988 | SE | 10.08.1988 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 10.08.1988 | |
IT | 10.08.1988 | ||
SE | 10.08.1988 | ||
Former [1989/35] | BE | 10.08.1988 | |
SE | 10.08.1988 | ||
Former [1989/24] | SE | 10.08.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2042172 (THOMSON INT CORP); | [X]GB1053251 ; | [X]GB2036202 (TASK POWER & CONTROL LTD); | [X]EP0052889 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [XE]US4456110 (HANKS JAMES V [US], et al); | [Y]GB2009354 (BORG WARNER); | [Y]US3207279 (AHLEN KARL GUSTAV [SE]); | [Y]US3488980 (BURROUGH DONALD E); | [Y]US2876881 (DENT PARRETT); | [A]FR2383358 (HOLSET ENGINEERING CO [GB]) |