EP0145645 - Device for tensioning lines, especially chains or belts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/31] | Device for tensioning links, especially chains or belts | ||
[1990/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RUD-Kettenfabrik Rieger & Dietz GmbH u. Co. Postfach 16 50 73406 Aalen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states RUD-Kettenfabrik Rieger & Dietz GmbH u. Co. Postfach 16 50 D-73406 Aalen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Speich, Helmut Filderweg 26 D-7081 Hüttlingen / DE | [1990/41] |
Former [1985/25] | 01 /
Speich, Helmut Filderweg 26 D-7081 H ttlingen / DE | Representative(s) | Böning, Manfred, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | Böning, Manfred, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Dieter Jander Dr.-Ing. Manfred Böning Leistikowstrasse 2 D-14050 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 84730129.8 | 30.11.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | DE19833344486 | 06.12.1983 Original published format: DE 3344486 | [1985/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0145645 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0145645 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0145645 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0145645 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | [1990/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16G11/12 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
F16G11/12 (EP,US);
A44B11/125 (EP,US);
Y10S24/909 (US);
Y10T24/21 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2175 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/25] | Title | German: | Spannvorrichtung für Spannstränge, insbesondere Ketten oder Gurte | [1990/30] | English: | Device for tensioning lines, especially chains or belts | [1990/30] | French: | Dispositif tendeur, en particulier pour chaînes ou sangles | [1985/31] |
Former [1985/25] | Spannvorrichtung f r Spannstr nge, insbesondere Ketten oder Gurte | ||
Former [1985/31] | Device for tensioning links, especially chains or belts | Examination procedure | 11.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/06] | 30.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2993680 (DAVIS FRANK L); | [A]US3175806 (PRETE JR ERNEST); | [A]FR2407097 (GOETEBORGA BANDVAEVERI [SE]) |