Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0145645
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.05.1991 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] |
21.09.1990 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 07.11.1990 [1990/45] |
24.08.1990 |
Change - inventor |
published on 10.10.1990 [1990/41] |
09.06.1990 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.07.1990 [1990/30] |
26.01.1989 |
First examination report |
|
22.12.1987 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.02.1988 [1988/06] |
25.08.1987 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.10.1987 [1987/42] |
29.05.1985 |
Change - English title |
published on 31.07.1985 [1985/31] |
29.05.1985 |
Change - French title |
published on 31.07.1985 [1985/31] |
20.04.1985 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.06.1985 [1985/25] |