Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE54998T | 15.08.1990 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3344486 | 06.12.1983 | EP84730129 | 30.11.1984 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3482824D1 | 30.08.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3482824 | 30.11.1984 | DE3344486 | 06.12.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU562330B | Global Dossier | 04.06.1987 | B2 | AU3633084 | 13.06.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3344486 | 06.12.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0145645 | Global Dossier | 25.07.1990 | B1 | EP0145645 | 14.10.1987 | A3 | EP0145645 | 19.06.1985 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3344486 | 06.12.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3344486 | 04.10.1990 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE3344486 | 06.12.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS60155378 | 15.08.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3344486 | 06.12.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4584742 | 29.04.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3344486 | 06.12.1983 |