EP0152720 - Control device of an intermediary conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1987 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plumettaz S.A. Route de Massongex CH-1880 Bex (Canton de Vaud) / CH | [1985/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plumettaz, Denis Ch. J.-Gallet CH-1880 Bex / CH | [1985/35] | Representative(s) | Rochat, Daniel Jean, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | Rochat, Daniel Jean, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 84810090.5 | 22.02.1984 | [1985/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0152720 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H02G1/08 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
G02B6/52 (EP);
G02B6/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/35] | Title | German: | Steuerungsvorrichtung eines Zwischenfördermittels | [1985/35] | English: | Control device of an intermediary conveyor | [1985/35] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'un transporteur intermédiaire | [1985/35] | File destroyed: | 01.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 21.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/06] | 24.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/24] | 16.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1557074 ; | [AD]DE3019667 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [A] - CONFERENCE EUROPEENNE SUR LES COMMUNICATIONS OPTIQUES, 21-24 septembre 1982, pages 517-522, Cannes, FR; T. SAKAI et al.: "Système de pose de câbles optiques avec machine de tirage intermédiaire" |