EP0134198 - Use of quinone derivatives for the protection of cultivated plants against the phytotoxic effects of herbicides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/11] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfister, Klaus, Dr. Joachimsackerstrasse 48 CH-4103 Bottmingen / CH | 02 /
Vogel, Rolf, Dr. Aumattstrasse 109 CH-4153 Reinach / CH | 03 /
Föry, Werner, Dr. Benkenstrasse 65 CH-4054 Basel / CH | [1985/11] | Application number, filing date | 84810384.2 | 06.08.1984 | [1985/11] | Priority number, date | CH19830004365 | 10.08.1983 Original published format: CH 436583 | [1985/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0134198 | Date: | 13.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/32 | [1985/11] | CPC: |
A01N25/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/11] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Chinonderivaten zum Schützen von Kulturpflanzen vor der phytotoxischen Wirkung von Herbiziden | [1985/11] | English: | Use of quinone derivatives for the protection of cultivated plants against the phytotoxic effects of herbicides | [1985/11] | French: | Utilisation des dérivés de quinone pour protéger les plantes cultivées contre l'effet phytotoxique des herbicides | [1985/11] | File destroyed: | 09.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 08.08.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 14.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.05.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/47] | 29.06.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1988 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP7336332 ; | [A]JP7334210 ; | [A]JP58113106 ; | [A]DE2210654 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 79, Nr. 13, 1. Oktober 1973, Seiten 161,162, Nr. 74943n, Columbus, Ohio, USA; & JP - A - 73 36332 (KANESHO CO., LTD.) 29.05.1973, & JP7336332 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 81, Nr. 7, 19. August 1974, Seite 151, Nr. 34576e, Columbus, Ohio, USA; & JP - A - 73 34210 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, INC.) 19.10.1973, & JP7334210 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 99, Nr. 21, 21. November 1983, Seite 250, Nr. 171337p, Columbus, Ohio, USA; & JP - A - 58 113 106 (TEIJIN LTD.) 05.07.1983, & JP58113106 A 00000000 |