EP0149423 - Process for the protection of keratinic material against the attack of keratin eating insects and phenoxytrifluoromethane sulfonanilides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1988 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1988 [1988/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böger, Manfred Wilhelm Glock-Strasse 14 D-7858 Weil am Rhein 5 / DE | 02 /
Reinehr, Dieter, Dr. Wolfsheule 10 D-7842 Kandern / DE | 03 /
Schmid, Werner Keltenweg 40 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | 04 /
De Sousa, Bernardo, Dr. Paradiesstrasse 15 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | [1985/30] | Application number, filing date | 84810607.6 | 10.12.1984 | [1985/30] | Priority number, date | CH19830006711 | 16.12.1983 Original published format: CH 671183 | [1985/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0149423 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0149423 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0149423 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07C143/75, D06M16/00 | [1985/30] | CPC: |
A01N41/06 (EP,US);
D06M16/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schützen von Keratinmaterial vor dem Befall durch keratinfressende Insekten und neue Phenoxytrifluormethansulfonanilide | [1985/30] | English: | Process for the protection of keratinic material against the attack of keratin eating insects and phenoxytrifluoromethane sulfonanilides | [1985/30] | French: | Procédé pour la protection de matière kératinique contre l'attaque par des insectes qui mangent la kératine et phénoxytrifluorométhanesulfonanilides | [1985/30] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/30] | 20.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR1188591 (BAYER AG); | [AD]US3066166 (FRIEDRICH MUTH, et al); | [AD]DE2118190 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | [AD]US3856859 (MOORE G, et al); | [AD]US3906024 (MOORE GEORGE G I, et al) |