Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0147369


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.11.1991 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.12.1991 [1991/52]
16.11.1990 (Expected) grant published on  02.01.1991 [1991/01]
17.05.1988 First examination report
20.10.1986 Publication of search report published on  10.12.1986 [1986/50]
04.05.1985 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.07.1985 [1985/27]
04.05.1985 Request for examination filed published on  03.07.1985 [1985/27]