blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0147369

EP0147369 - Cellulosic material ionically modified, its preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.11.1991
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.1991 [1991/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CIBA-GEIGY AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1985/27]For all designated states
CIBA-GEIGY AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
CH-4002 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Merz, Jürg, Dr.
Langgartenstrasse 51
CH-4105 Biel-Benken / CH
02 / Voser, Walter, Dr.
Alemannenweg 2
CH-4123 Allschwil / CH
[1985/27]
Application number, filing date84810629.017.12.1984
[1985/27]
Priority number, dateCH1983000685622.12.1983         Original published format: CH 685683
[1985/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0147369
Date:03.07.1985
Language:DE
[1985/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0147369
Date:10.12.1986
Language:DE
[1986/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0147369
Date:02.01.1991
Language:DE
[1991/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.1986
ClassificationIPC:C08B11/15, B01J20/22, B01D15/08
[1985/27]
CPC:
C08B11/15 (EP,US); B01D15/361 (EP,US); B01J20/22 (EP,US);
B01J41/20 (EP,US); B01D15/364 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1985/27]
TitleGerman:Ionisch modifiziertes Cellulosematerial, dessen Herstellung und Verwendung[1985/27]
English:Cellulosic material ionically modified, its preparation and use[1985/27]
French:Produit cellulosique modifié ioniquement, sa préparation et application[1985/27]
Examination procedure19.12.1984Examination requested  [1985/27]
19.05.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.07.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.1990Fee for grant paid
31.08.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.1989Renewal fee patent year 06
03.11.1990Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB733100  (TNO)
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 75, Nr. 4, 26. Juli 1971, Seite 119, Zusammenfassung Nr. 22753y, Columbus, Ohio, US; J. PASTYR et al.: "Preparation and properties of the sulfoethyl cellulose ion-exchanger based on crosslinked microcrystalline cellulose", & CELLUL. CHEM. TECHNOL. 1971, 5(1), 17-22
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 94, Nr. 10, 9. März 1981, Seite 101, Zusammenfassung Nr. 67479x, Columbus, Ohio, US; N.E. KOTEL'NIKOVA et al.: "Study of the structure and chromatographic properties of microcrystalline cellulose produced from birchwood", & KHIM. DREV. 1980, (6), 3-12
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.