EP0150676 - 1:2 Chromium complex dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1989 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.1989 [1989/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beffa, Fabio, Dr. Burgstrasse 38 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | [1985/32] | Application number, filing date | 84810644.9 | 19.12.1984 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | CH19840000053 | 06.01.1984 Original published format: CH 5384 | [1985/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0150676 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0150676 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0150676 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C09B56/02, D06P3/06 | [1985/32] | CPC: |
C09B55/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1985/32] | Title | German: | 1:2-chromkomplexfarbstoffe | [1985/32] | English: | 1:2 Chromium complex dyes | [1985/32] | French: | Colorants 1:2 complexes de chrome | [1985/32] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/32] | 22.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0079858 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) |