EP0138777 - Automatically removable top bottle covering cup by washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 10.01.1990 [1990/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fabbro, Alberto n. 36 Via Udine I-33010 Cassacco (Udine) / IT | [1985/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/17] | Representative(s) | D'Agostini, Giovanni D'Agostini Organizzazione S.r.l. Via G. Giusti 17 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | D'Agostini, Giovanni, Dr. D'AGOSTINI ORGANIZZAZIONE Via G. Giusti 17 I-33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 84830253.5 | 17.09.1984 | [1985/17] | Priority number, date | IT19830083475 | 18.10.1983 Original published format: IT 8347583 | [1985/17] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0138777 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0138777 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0138777 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/62 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
B65D55/0854 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/17] | Title | German: | Schutzkappe für Flaschen die bei Reinigung der Flasche automatisch entfernt werden kann | [1985/17] | English: | Automatically removable top bottle covering cup by washing machine | [1985/17] | French: | Capsule de surbouchage pour bouteille destinée à être enlevée automatiquement lors du lavage de la bouteille | [1985/17] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 04.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/07] | 23.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.11.1988 | BE | 23.11.1988 | CH | 23.11.1988 | LI | 23.11.1988 | NL | 23.11.1988 | SE | 23.11.1988 | [1990/02] |
Former [1989/46] | AT | 23.11.1988 | |
BE | 23.11.1988 | ||
NL | 23.11.1988 | ||
SE | 23.11.1988 | ||
Former [1989/42] | BE | 23.11.1988 | |
NL | 23.11.1988 | ||
SE | 23.11.1988 | ||
Former [1989/35] | BE | 23.11.1988 | |
SE | 23.11.1988 | ||
Former [1989/24] | SE | 23.11.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2111706 (VISCOSE DEVELOPMENT CO LTD [GB]); | [A]FR2233176 (JANNER SILVIA [IT]); | [A]FR2391275 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [A]DE2927510 (TSCHEULIN ALUMINIUM); | [A]DE3027649 (TSCHEULIN ALUMINIUM [DE]) |