EP0148731 - Pyjamas provided with closeable openings for the body examination, particularly for bed-ridden patients [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pagani, Adriano Via Michele Mercati 45 00197 Roma / IT | For all designated states Mazzetti di Pietralata, Mario Via Antonio Musa 5a I-00161 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | For all designated states Pagani, Adriano Via Michele Mercati 45 I-00197 Roma / IT | ||
For all designated states Mazzetti di Pietralata, Mario Via Antonio Musa 5a I-00161 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mazzetti di Pietralata, Mario Via Antonio Musa 5a I-00161 Roma / IT | [1985/29] | Representative(s) | Cavattoni, Massimo STUDIO TECNICO BREVETTI MASSIMO CAVATTONI Via Archimede, 144 00197 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | Cavattoni, Massimo STUDIO TECNICO BREVETTI MASSIMO CAVATTONI Via Archimede, 144 I-00197 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 84830261.8 | 28.09.1984 | [1985/29] | Priority number, date | IT19830049080 | 29.09.1983 Original published format: IT 4908083 | [1985/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0148731 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/12, A41D10/00 | [1985/29] | CPC: |
A41D13/1263 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/29] | Title | German: | Mit schliessbaren Öffnungen versehener Pyjama, um der Körper zu untersuchen, insbesondere für bettlägerige Patienten | [1985/29] | English: | Pyjamas provided with closeable openings for the body examination, particularly for bed-ridden patients | [1985/29] | French: | Pyjama pourvu d'ouvertures refermables pour l'examen du corps, en particulier pour des malades alités | [1985/29] | File destroyed: | 15.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 14.04.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/38] | 25.06.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2257426 [ ] (ISADORE NEIMAN); | GB2027330 [ ] (OU LIEH HSUAN); | US4258440 [ ] (MCGOWAN MALISSA); | US4382303 [ ] (LUNT AUDREY T [US]); | US4422186 [ ] (LONEY ANN M [US]); | FR2543802 [ ] (MARTIN JEAN PAUL [FR]) |