EP0116019 - A method of joining preferably tubular bodies end-to-end and an apparatus for performing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.1987 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAB SYSTEM AB S-453 00 Lysekil / SE | [1984/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niklasson, Tage Fregattvägen 8 S-453 00 Lysekil / SE | [1984/33] | Representative(s) | Mossmark, Anders Lennart, et al Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Mossmark, Anders Lennart, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1984/33] | Mossmark, Anders, et al Albihn West AB, Box 142 S-401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 84850001.3 | 02.01.1984 | [1984/33] | Priority number, date | SE19830000027 | 04.01.1983 Original published format: SE 8300027 | [1984/33] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0116019 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B29C27/04 | [1984/33] | CPC: |
B29C65/04 (EP);
B29C66/1142 (EP);
B29C66/1222 (EP);
B29C66/1224 (EP);
B29C66/5221 (EP);
B29C66/5229 (EP);
B29C66/52293 (EP);
B29C66/636 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/8221 (EP);
B29C66/8242 (EP);
B29C66/8324 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL [1984/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Endverbinden vorzugsweise rohrförmiger Körper und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1984/33] | English: | A method of joining preferably tubular bodies end-to-end and an apparatus for performing the method | [1984/33] | French: | Procédé pour le raccordement final de corps de préférence tubulaires et dispositif pour la réalisation du procédé | [1984/33] | File destroyed: | 02.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 22.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/06] | 10.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.08.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/09] | 16.09.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1344411 [ ] (HELLER W C); | DE904334 [ ] (LORENZ C AG); | AT190273B [ ] (ETERNIT WERKE HATSCHEK L); | DE2455503 [ ] (ATOMENERGI AB); | DE1479232 [ ]; | DE2332174 [ ] |