EP0127595 - Hydrogen sulfide decomposition cell and catalytic materials therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC. 1675 West Maple Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | For all designated states ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC. 1675 West Maple Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Venkatesan, Srinivasan 1835 Chester Road, Apt. 5 Royal Oak Michigan 48073 / US | 02 /
Sapru, Krishna 1924 Smallbrook Court Troy Michigan 48098 / US | 03 /
Pinsky, Naum 22111 Erwin Street Apt. R-223 Woodland Hills California 91367 / US | [1984/49] | Representative(s) | Wiklund, Erik, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | Wiklund, Erik, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 84850095.5 | 26.03.1984 | [1984/49] | Priority number, date | US19830479476 | 28.03.1983 Original published format: US 479476 | [1984/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0127595 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0127595 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C25B11/04, H01M4/90, H01M8/22, C10K1/10 | [1984/49] | CPC: |
H01M8/22 (EP,US);
C10K1/10 (EP,US);
C25B1/00 (EP,US);
C25B11/04 (EP,US);
H01M4/90 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/49] | Title | German: | Wasserstoffsulfid-Zerlegungszelle und katalytische Stoffe dafür | [1984/49] | English: | Hydrogen sulfide decomposition cell and catalytic materials therefor | [1984/49] | French: | Cellule de décomposition de sulfure d'hydrogène et matériaux catalytiques pour celle-ci | [1984/49] | File destroyed: | 09.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 11.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/20] | 30.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/19] | 16.12.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2075551 (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC); | [A]GB1161495 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR [DE]); | [AD]US4320180 (NOZAKI KEN) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 97, no. 12, 20th September 1982, page 559, no. 100542z, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.A. GRISHAEVA et al.: "Electrochemical decomposition of hydrogen sulfide", & VESTSI AKAD. NAVUK BSSR, SER FIZ.-ENERG. NAVUK 1982, (2), 85-7 |