EP0138781 - Method and apparatus for flue-gas cleaning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lindahl, Erik Appelboms väg 14 S-186 00 Vallentuna / SE | For all designated states Hovsenius, Gunnar Tunavägen 32 S-194 51 Upplands Väsby / SE | [1985/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/17] | Representative(s) | Örtenblad, Bertil Tore Noréns Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 10198 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Örtenblad, Bertil Tore Noréns Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 10198 100 55 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1985/17] | Örtenblad, Bertil Tore Noréns Patentbyra AB Box 27034 S-102 51 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 84850239.9 | 09.08.1984 | [1985/17] | Priority number, date | SE19830004716 | 31.08.1983 Original published format: SE 8304716 | [1985/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0138781 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0138781 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0138781 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0138781 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
B01D53/68 (EP,US);
B01D53/34 (EP,US);
B01D53/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1985/17] | Title | German: | Methode und Apparat zur Rauchgasreinigung | [1990/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for flue-gas cleaning | [1985/17] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la purification de fumée | [1985/17] |
Former [1985/17] | Methode und Apparat zur Rauchgasreinigng | Examination procedure | 27.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/36] | 22.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.1991
10.10.1991
ADMISSIBLE ABB Fläkt Aktiebolag Sickla Alle 13 Nacka S-120 86 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Eitle, Werner Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.1991
10.10.1991
ADMISSIBLE ABB Fläkt Aktiebolag Sickla Alle 13 SE-13134 Nacka / SE Opponent's representative Eitle, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | 15.10.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.02.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.02.1992 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.1992 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 01.04.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 16.04.1993 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.07.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.11.1996 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 15.09.1993 | Appeal received No. T0839/93 | 25.11.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.09.1995 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1995/37] | 06.11.1995 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/45] | 01.07.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [1994/24] |
Former [1994/23] | FR | 30.04.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3841060 (HOAD J); | [A]FR2283719 (SEITETSU KAGAKU CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE2708919 (OTTO & CO GMBH DR C); | [A]DE2449057 |