EP0145683 - Industrial robot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1988 [1988/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA AB S-721 83 Västeras / SE | [1985/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brantmark, Hakan Snödroppsvägen 41 S-72243 Västeras / SE | 02 /
Hardegard, Eric Stövarvägen 8 S-72243 Västeras / SE | [1985/25] | Representative(s) | Grennberg, Erik Bertil, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | Grennberg, Erik Bertil, et al H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 84850281.1 | 24.09.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | SE19830005378 | 30.09.1983 Original published format: SE 8305378 | [1985/25] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0145683 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0145683 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/18 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
B25J13/003 (EP);
G05B19/409 (EP);
G05B2219/35453 (EP);
G05B2219/45083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1985/25] | Title | German: | Industrieroboter | [1985/25] | English: | Industrial robot | [1985/25] | French: | Robot industriel | [1985/25] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/48] | 09.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0023864 [ ]; | EP0056507 [ ]; | US3742143 [ ] |