EP0138794 - A method for recovering metal values from materials containing copper and/or precious metals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.1989 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.01.1990 [1990/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boliden Aktiebolag Box 5508 S-114 85 Stockholm / SE | [1985/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holmström, Sven Ake Kadettgatan 40 S-930 30 Ursviken / SE | [1985/17] | Representative(s) | Lundin, Björn-Eric Trelleborg AB Patents and Trade Marks Box 21024 100 31 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | Lundin, Björn-Eric Trelleborg AB Patents and Trade Marks Box 21024 S-100 31 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1985/17] | Lundin, Björn-Eric Trelleborg AB Patents and Trade Marks Box 21024 S-100 31 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 84850289.4 | 28.09.1984 | [1985/17] | Priority number, date | SE19830005425 | 03.10.1983 Original published format: SE 8305425 | [1985/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0138794 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0138794 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C22B1/08, C22B11/00, C22B15/00 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
C22B11/023 (EP,US);
C22B1/08 (EP,US);
C22B15/0006 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Gewinnung von Metallen aus Kupfer und/oder Edelmetallen enthaltenden Materialien | [1985/24] | English: | A method for recovering metal values from materials containing copper and/or precious metals | [1985/17] | French: | Procédé de récuperation des métaux à partir de matière contenant du cuivre et/ou des métaux nobles | [1985/24] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/01] | 25.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE355886 [ ] (CHARLES BENNEJEANT); | SE331365 [ ] (BOLIDEN AB [SE]); | US4107310 [ ] (ALLAIS ANDRE, et al); | WO7900104 [ ] (BOLIDEN AB [SE], et al); | WO8201381 [ ] (BOLIDEN AB [SE], et al) | [Y] - Advances in extractive metallurgy 1977, International symposium organized by the Institution of Mining and Metallurgy, London 1977; ed. M.J. JONES,pages 53-56, 161-167: R. BLOISE et al: "Study of stibnite chlorination: thermodynamic and experimental aspects". I. IMRIS et al: "Segregation roasting of antimony raw materials" | Examination | US1107310 |