EP0140856 - Cryogen shot blast deflashing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.1990 [1990/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGA AKTIEBOLAG 181 81 Lidingö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | For all designated states AGA AKTIEBOLAG S-181 81 Lidingö / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brull, John 67 West Bel Meadow Chagrin Falls Ohio / US | 02 /
Schmitz, Robert 88 East Bel Meadow Chagrin Falls Ohio / US | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | Karlzén, Bengt Erik, et al AGA AB Patent Department S-181 81 Lidingö / SE | [1985/19] | Application number, filing date | 84850303.3 | 12.10.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | US19830546431 | 28.10.1983 Original published format: US 546431 | [1985/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0140856 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0140856 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0140856 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B24C3/26 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
B24C3/263 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL, SE [1985/19] | Title | German: | Tiefsttemperatur-Schleuderstrahlvorrichtung zum Abgraten | [1985/29] | English: | Cryogen shot blast deflashing system | [1985/19] | French: | Dispositif d'ébavurage par jet abrasif cryogénique | [1985/29] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 19.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 24.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1073057 (WHEELABRATOR CORP); | [A]GB1048477 (PANGBORN CORP); | [A]DE3035674 (SPALECK GMBH MAX [DE]); | [A]SU177067 ; | [A]US3728825 (BARRETT C) | [A] - KUNSTSTOFFBERATER, vol. 26, no. 11, November 1981, page 10, Frankfurt/Main, DE; "Strahlmaschinen für saubere Entgratung" | [A] - CRYOGENICS, vol. 21, no. 10, October 1981, page 630, Guildford, Surrey, GB; "Deflashing comes to Europe" |