EP0143759 - Analyzing probe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.1989 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geotronics Metaltech AB Box 45 S-190 63 Örsundsbro / SE | [1986/04] |
Former [1985/23] | For all designated states Kumbrant, Lars Villavägen 9 S-190 63 Örsundsbro / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumbrant, Lars Villavägen 9 S-190 63 Örsundsbro / SE | [2007/32] |
Former [1986/04] | 01 /
Kumbrant, Lars Villavägen 9 | ||
Former [1985/23] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Forssell, Gunilla Angelica Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Forssell, Gunilla H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1988/35] | Forssell, Gunilla H. ALBIHNS PATENTBYRA AB Box 3137 S-10362 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1988/30] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1985/23] | Bjellman, Lennart Olov Henrik, et al DR. LUDWIG BRANN PATENTBYRA AB Box 1344 S-751 43 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 84850314.0 | 22.10.1984 | [1985/23] | Priority number, date | SE19830005914 | 27.10.1983 Original published format: SE 8305914 | [1985/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0143759 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0143759 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/69 | [1985/23] | CPC: |
G01N21/69 (EP,SE,US);
Y10S73/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/23] | Title | German: | Analysiersonde | [1985/30] | English: | Analyzing probe | [1985/23] | French: | Sonde analytique | [1985/30] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 25.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/44] | 10.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/12] | 24.10.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.1986 | 31.10.1988 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP5981540 ; | [Y]US3659944 (BOJIC MILAN); | [A]US4140019 (FALK RICHARD A) | [Y] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 192 (P-298)[1629], 4th September 1984; & JP - A - 59 81540 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU K.K.) 11-05-1984, & JP5981540 A 00000000 |