EP0143762 - Apparatus for dispensing a predetermined weight per unit of time of nonfree-flowing particulate material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/23] | Apparatus and method for dispensing a predetermined weight per unit of time of nonfree-flowing particulate material | ||
[1990/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alwerud, Tomas 8031 La Jolla Scenic Drive La Jolla, Ca 92037 / US | [1985/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/23] | Representative(s) | Lenz, Franz, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | Lenz, Franz, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 84850328.0 | 29.10.1984 | [1985/23] | Priority number, date | US19830546396 | 28.10.1983 Original published format: US 546396 | [1985/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0143762 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143762 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/19 | [1985/23] | CPC: |
G01G11/12 (EP,US);
B65G47/19 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/23] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Abgeben eines vorbestimmten Gewichtes pro Zeiteinheit eines nicht freifliessenden körnigen Materials | [1990/06] | English: | Apparatus for dispensing a predetermined weight per unit of time of nonfree-flowing particulate material | [1990/06] | French: | Dispositif pour la distribution d'un poids déterminé par unité de temps d'un matériau granuleux à écoulement non libre | [1990/06] |
Former [1985/23] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Abgeben eines vorbestimmten Gewichtes pro Zeiteinheit eines nicht freifliessenden körnigen Materials | ||
Former [1985/23] | Apparatus and method for dispensing a predetermined weight per unit of time of nonfree-flowing particulate material | ||
Former [1985/23] | Dispositif et procédé pour la distribution d'un poids déterminé par unité de temps d'un matériau granuleux à écoulement non libre | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 03.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/10] | 20.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.1990 | IT | 07.02.1990 | [1999/42] |
Former [1990/52] | AT | 07.02.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | DE1222428 [ ] (KALLE AG); | US3448967 [ ] (SEANOR REX C, et al); | FR2282387 [ ] (WAHL EUGENE ADAM [US]); | DE2618911 [ ] (GLOWATZKI WALDEMAR); | DE2714903 [ ] (DEGUSSA) |