EP0134779 - Control device for a pressurized-fluid operated motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1988 [1988/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ing. Waldhauser Maschinenfabrik Gesellschaft mbH & Co. KG Puchbachweg 239 A-8591 Maria Lankowitz / AT | [1985/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knieschek, Siegbert Feldgasse 7 A-8580 Köflach / AT | [1985/12] | Representative(s) | Gibler, Ferdinand Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte OG Dorotheergasse 7/14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | Gibler, Ferdinand, Dipl.Ing. Dr. techn. Dorotheergasse 7/14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 84890146.8 | 01.08.1984 | [1985/12] | Priority number, date | AT19830002797 | 02.08.1983 Original published format: AT 279783 | [1985/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0134779 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0134779 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F01L25/06, F16H35/14 | [1985/12] | CPC: |
F01L25/063 (EP);
F01L25/00 (EP);
F01L27/02 (EP);
F01L31/00 (EP);
F16H35/14 (EP);
F01L2003/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/12] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Steuerung eines mit einem Druckmedium betriebenen Motors | [1985/12] | English: | Control device for a pressurized-fluid operated motor | [1985/12] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour un moteur à fluide à pression | [1985/12] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/49] | 10.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE134618 ; | [A]FR375250 (RICHARD KNOLLER [FR]); | [A]GB164925 (DAVID AULD & SONS LTD, et al); | [A]WO8002722 (ROSER E) |