EP0158765 - Rotary engine, rotary compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.1987 [1987/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petutschnig, Hubert Hauptstrasse 100 A-2454 Trautmannsdorf / AT | [1985/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1987/06] |
Former [1985/43] | Puchberger, Rolf, Dipl. Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl. Ing. Georg Puchberger Dipl. Ing. Rolf Puchberger Dipl. Ing. Peter Puchberger Singerstrasse 13 Postfach 55 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 84890191.4 | 12.10.1984 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | AT19830003645 | 13.10.1983 Original published format: AT 364583 | AT19830004145 | 28.11.1983 Original published format: AT 414583 | AT19840001249 | 13.04.1984 Original published format: AT 124984 | [1985/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0158765 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/44, F02B53/00, F04C2/44 | [1985/43] | CPC: |
F01C21/106 (EP);
F01C1/44 (EP);
F02B2075/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | IT [1985/43] | Title | German: | Rotationsmotor, Rotationsverdichter | [1985/43] | English: | Rotary engine, rotary compressor | [1985/43] | French: | Moteur rotatif, compresseur rotatif | [1985/43] | File destroyed: | 02.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 16.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/25] | 29.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/45] | 01.06.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1986 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2237501 ; | [Y]FR1404453 ; | [Y]US3442257 ; | [Y]US3642391 ; | [Y]CH440832 ; | [A]US3989427 ; | [A]AT240108B ; | [A]AT228003B ; | [A]DE1526408 ; | [A]DE1451741 ; | [A]DE2047732 ; | [A]US3295505 ; | [A]FR1422744 |