EP0127679 - GRIP AND STOCK ASSEMBLY FOR FACILITATING USE OF A COMPACT GUN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.1989 [1989/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STURM, RUGER & COMPANY, INC. Lacey Place Southport Connecticut 06490 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | For all designated states STURM, RUGER & COMPANY, INC. Lacey Place Southport Connecticut 06490 / US | ||
Former [1984/50] | For all designated states UZI R & D ASSOCIATES 360 E. 57th Street New York, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAL, Uzi 7900 "C" Stenton Ave., No. 105 Chestnut Hill Village Philadelphia, PA 19118 / US | [1984/50] | Representative(s) | Haigh, Charles Roy, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/50] | Haigh, Charles Roy, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 84900252.2 | 09.12.1983 | [1984/50] | WO1983US01933 | Priority number, date | US19820448828 | 10.12.1982 Original published format: US 448828 | [1984/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8402393 | Date: | 21.06.1984 | [1984/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0127679 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0127679 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F41C23/00 | [1984/50] | CPC: |
F41C23/04 (EP,US);
F41C23/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1984/50] | Title | German: | GRIFF- UND SCHAFTANORDNUNG FÜR KOMPAKTGEWEHRE | [1984/50] | English: | GRIP AND STOCK ASSEMBLY FOR FACILITATING USE OF A COMPACT GUN | [1984/50] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE DE CROSSE ET DE MONTURE FACILITANT L'UTILISATION D'UNE ARME COMPACTE | [1984/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.1984 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.1984 | Search fee paid | 01.08.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 30.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB168890 (JOSEPH BENKE) | [X] - D.H.R. ARCHER M.A.: "Jane's infantry weapons", 1976, Jane's Yearbooks, LONDON (GB), | [L] - E.C. EZELL: "Small arms of the world", 1983, 12th edition, Arms and Armour Press, LONDON (GB), | International search | [X]US2145078 (BRUCE FERREL CLYDE); | [Y]US2200780 (HUGO SCHMEISSER); | [Y]US3184877 (ANDREWS WILLIAM G); | [Y]US3609902 (CASULL RICHARD J); | [Y]US3906833 (OROZCO HECTOR MENDOZA); | [Y]US4271623 (BERETTA PIER C); | [Y]US4291482 (BRESAN JOSEPH R); | [YP]US4383384 (FOX GERARD J) | Examination | - D.H.R. ARCHER M.A.: "Jane's infantry weapons", 1976,Jane's Yearbooks, LONDON (GB), p.122 | - E.C. EZELL: "Small arms of the world", 1983, 12th edition, Arms and Armour Press, London(GB), p.317, (Sten Mark IV, model B with stock folded) |