EP0131602 - CARTON FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAMES HARDIE CONTAINERS LIMITED Ashover Road Rocklea, QLD 4016 / AU | [1985/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FITZGIBBON, Maxwell, Alan 4 Boomerang Road West St. Lucia, QLD 4067 / AU | 02 /
WAITE, Graham, Edward 45 Bolinda Street Eight Mile Plains, QLD 4123 / AU | 03 /
JONES, Gregory, Thomas 6 Clarinda Avenue Springwood, QLD 4127 / AU | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Woodin, Anthony John, et al Fitzpatricks Europe House Box No. 88 World Trade Centre East Smithfield London E1 9AA / GB | [1985/47] |
Former [1985/04] | Connor, Terence Kevin FITZPATRICKS Kern House 61/62 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2B 6EX / GB | Application number, filing date | 84900486.6 | 16.01.1984 | [1985/04] | WO1984AU00008 | Priority number, date | AU19830007659 | 18.01.1983 Original published format: AU 765983 | [1985/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8402878 | Date: | 02.08.1984 | [1984/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0131602 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B31B3/00, B31B3/36 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
B31B50/00 (EP,US);
B31B50/262 (EP,US);
B31B2100/00 (EP,US);
B31B2100/0022 (EP,US);
B31B2120/30 (EP,US);
B31B50/042 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/04] | Title | German: | PAPPENBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1985/04] | English: | CARTON FORMING APPARATUS | [1985/04] | French: | APPAREIL DE FORMAGE DE CARTON | [1985/04] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.1984 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.1984 | Search fee paid | 31.08.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.1984 | Examination requested [1985/04] | 03.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/23] | 13.01.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1956268 (GUSCHKY & TOENNESMANN KG); | [Y]GB2016999 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [X]DE2912731 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]US4319878 (DOZIER HENRY L, et al) | International search | [A]US1926364 (SAMUEL BERGSTEIN); | [A]US3884130 (STOLKIN WALTER J, et al) |