EP0131622 - TUBULAR COUPLING WITH IMPROVED METAL TO METAL SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDRIL COMPANY 714 West Olympic Boulevard Los Angeles California 90015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states HYDRIL COMPANY 714 West Olympic Boulevard Los Angeles California 90015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOSE, Thomas, L. 1243 Kingsbridge Houston, TX 77073 / US | 02 /
REEVES, Doyle, E. 11310 Colonial Trail Houston, TX 77066 / US | 03 /
ORTLOFF, Donald, J. 3803 Valleyfield Houston, TX 77080 / US | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84900780.2 | 13.01.1984 | [1985/04] | WO1984US00039 | Priority number, date | US19830458732 | 17.01.1983 Original published format: US 458732 | [1985/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8402948 | Date: | 02.08.1984 | [1984/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0131622 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131622 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/042, F16L15/00 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
F16L15/004 (EP,US);
E21B17/0423 (EP,US);
E21B17/08 (EP,US);
F16L15/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/04] | Title | German: | ROHRVERBINDUNG MIT VERBESSERTER METALL-GEGEN-METALL-DICHTUNG | [1985/04] | English: | TUBULAR COUPLING WITH IMPROVED METAL TO METAL SEAL | [1985/04] | French: | ACCOUPLEMENT TUBULAIRE AVEC JOINT AMELIORE METAL/METAL | [1985/04] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.1984 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/23] | 04.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.1988 | BE | 20.07.1988 | CH | 20.07.1988 | LI | 20.07.1988 | NL | 20.07.1988 | SE | 20.07.1988 | LU | 31.01.1989 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/27] | AT | 20.07.1988 | |
BE | 20.07.1988 | ||
CH | 20.07.1988 | ||
LI | 20.07.1988 | ||
NL | 20.07.1988 | ||
SE | 20.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/24] | AT | 20.07.1988 | |
BE | 20.07.1988 | ||
NL | 20.07.1988 | ||
SE | 20.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 20.07.1988 | |
BE | 20.07.1988 | ||
NL | 20.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/11] | BE | 20.07.1988 | |
NL | 20.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/04] | BE | 20.07.1988 | Cited in | International search | US2006520 [ ] (FREDERICK STONE, et al); | US2258066 [ ] (ERLING OYEN); | US2450453 [ ] (EMANUEL BOEHM MILOS); | US2574081 [ ] (ABEGG WALTER A); | US2893759 [ ] (BLOSE THOMAS L); | US2992019 [ ] (MACARTHUR MELVIN D); | EP0089253 [ ] (VALLOUREC [FR]) |