EP0134240 - PATTERN MATRIX HAVING UNIFORM BACKER THICKNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.03.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITED STATES GYPSUM COMPANY 101 South Wacker Drive Chicago Illinois 60606 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | For all designated states UNITED STATES GYPSUM COMPANY 101 South Wacker Drive Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IZARD, David, Graham 26610 West Marion Street Wauconda, IL 60684 / US | [1985/12] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Terence Leslie, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | Johnson, Terence Leslie, et al Edward Evans & Co. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 84900819.8 | 25.01.1984 | [1985/12] | WO1984US00115 | Priority number, date | US19830462672 | 31.01.1983 Original published format: US 462672 | [1985/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8402873 | Date: | 02.08.1984 | [1984/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0134240 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B29C1/02, B32B3/10, D21F11/00 | [1985/12] | CPC: |
D21F11/006 (EP,US);
B29C33/40 (EP,US);
B29C39/026 (EP,US);
B29C70/70 (EP,US);
B29K2105/08 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0809 (EP,US);
B29K2105/20 (EP,US);
B29K2305/00 (EP,US);
B29K2309/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL [1985/12] | Title | German: | MUSTERMATRIZE MIT GLEICHMÄSSIGER SUBSTRATDICKE | [1985/12] | English: | PATTERN MATRIX HAVING UNIFORM BACKER THICKNESS | [1985/12] | French: | MATRICE DE MOTIFS A EPAISSEUR DE SUPPORT UNIFORME | [1985/12] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.1984 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.1984 | Search fee paid | 17.08.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/16] | 30.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.11.1988 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/18] | 07.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1989/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8203595 (UNITED STATES GYPSUM CO [US]); | [A]US4203714 (WENANDER HARALD S [SE]); | [A]FR1078014 (TECH DU VERRE TISSE); | [A]US3914368 (HARKNESS RICHARD ERNEST); | [A]FR2345276 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE], et al); | [A]US3337388 (WOSABA II CHARLES L); | [AD]US3391013 (VIDEEN OTIS R); | [AD]US3511744 (GARRETT FRED JR) | International search | [A]US2221200 (PERRY EUGENE L); | [A]US3121660 (HALL JR EDWARD H); | [A]US3562863 (FORNES GASTON G); | [A]US3594244 (MACKINNON JOHN, et al); | [A]US3720578 (HELING W, et al); | [A]US3773879 (MUNSIL W, et al); | [A]US4229400 (LAURIE WILLIAM A) |