EP0144426 - METHOD OF CHECKING TOOL INTERFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.1990 [1990/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHI, Hajimu Hino Hirayamadai jutaku 1104 6-7-8, Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | 02 /
SEKI, Masaki 3-15-2-406, Takaido-nishi Suginami-ku Tokyo 168 / JP | 03 /
TAKEGAHARA, Takashi Janbohru Hachioji 604 4-1-9, Myoujin-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192 / JP | [1985/25] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84900875.0 | 20.02.1984 | [1985/25] | WO1984JP00053 | Priority number, date | JP19830086468 | 17.05.1983 Original published format: JP 8646883 | [1985/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8404479 | Date: | 22.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0144426 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0144426 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.1984 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/00, G05B19/18 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
G05B19/4061 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49157 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/25] | Title | German: | KONTROLLVERFAHREN DER WERKZEUGINTERFERENZ | [1989/16] | English: | METHOD OF CHECKING TOOL INTERFERENCE | [1985/25] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONTROLE D'INTERFERENCE D'OUTIL | [1985/25] |
Former [1985/25] | KONTROLLVERFAHREN DER WERKZEUGINTERFE RENZ | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.1985 | Translation filed | 21.01.1985 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.1985 | Search fee paid | 21.01.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/25] | 16.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0089561 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS5464276 (HAMILL CO INC); | [A]JPS485085 ; | [A]JPS57194855 (FUJITSU FANUC LTD); | [A]JPS55110309 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS54132088 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) |