EP0170652 - ASSAY FOR IMMOBILIZED REPORTER GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.1990 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLECULAR BIOSYSTEMS, INC. 11180 Roselle Street, Suite A San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [1986/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNOLD, Lyle, J., Jr. 5439 Noah Way San Diego, CA 92117 / US | [1986/07] | Representative(s) | Collier, Jeremy Austin Grey, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1986/07] | Application number, filing date | 84901033.5 | 27.01.1984 | [1986/07] | WO1984US00138 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8503356 | Date: | 01.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0170652 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.08.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/54, C12Q1/68 | [1986/07] | CPC: |
G01N33/533 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/07] | Title | German: | TEST FÜR IMMOBILISIERTE REPORTERGRUPPEN | [1986/07] | English: | ASSAY FOR IMMOBILIZED REPORTER GROUPS | [1986/07] | French: | ANALYSE POUR LA DETECTION DE GROUPES RAPPORTEURS IMMOBILISES | [1986/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.1985 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.1985 | Search fee paid | 26.09.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/14] | 28.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/16] | 09.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4228237 (HEVEY RICHARD C, et al); | [Y]US4298685 (PARIKH INDU, et al); | [X]EP0063879 (UNIV YALE [US]); | [Y]US4358535 (FALKOW STANLEY, et al); | [X]US4383031 (BOGUSLASKI ROBERT C, et al); | [XP]EP0123300 (ENZO BIOCHEM INC [US]); | [XP]JPS607362 (FUJIREBIO KK); | [XP]EP0131830 (MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) | International search | US4228237 [ ] (HEVEY RICHARD C, et al); | US4231999 [ ] (CARISSON JAN P E, et al); | US4298685 [ ] (PARIKH INDU, et al); | US4334017 [ ] (PLOTKIN GEORGE M, et al); | EP0063879 [ ] (UNIV YALE [US]); | US4358535 [ ] (FALKOW STANLEY, et al); | US4383031 [ ] (BOGUSLASKI ROBERT C, et al) |