EP0139012 - CUTTING APPARATUS FOR WELDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1989 [1989/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION No. 1-28, 1-Chome Kitahonmachi-Dori Chuo-Ku, Kobe-City Hyogo 651 / JP | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/18] | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION No. 1-28, 1-Chome Kitahonmachi-Dori Chuo-Ku, Kobe-City Hyogo 651 / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATOU, Kazuo 3-306, Midorigaoka Kamogatacho Asaguchi-Gun Okayama 719-02 / JP | 02 /
MIZUGAMI, Susumu 465-8, Chayamachihayaoki Kurashiki-shi Okayama 709-11 / JP | 03 /
TABUCHI, Mamoru 6244-30, Tamashimakashiwajima Kurashiki-shi Okayama 713 / JP | 04 /
NAKAMURA, Masayuki Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Itami Seisakusho 1-1, Tukaguchi honmachi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661 / JP | 05 /
KOBAYASHI, Toshiyuki Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Itami Seisakusho 1-1, Tukaguchi honmachi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661 / JP | 06 /
RITOH, Naotake Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha Itami Seisakusho 1-1, Tukaguchi honmachi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661 / JP | [1985/18] | Representative(s) | Lawson, David Glynne, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [1985/18] | Application number, filing date | 84901101.0 | 09.03.1984 | [1985/18] | WO1984JP00096 | Priority number, date | JP19830041352 | 11.03.1983 Original published format: JP 4135283 | [1985/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8403462 | Date: | 13.09.1984 | [1984/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0139012 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0139012 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B23D15/08, B23D31/02 | [1985/18] | CPC: |
B23K26/26 (EP,US);
B23D15/00 (EP,US);
B23D15/06 (EP,US);
B23D33/00 (EP,US);
B23K9/025 (EP,US);
B23Q1/0063 (EP,US);
Y10T409/309912 (EP,US);
Y10T83/874 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8743 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1985/18] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHWEISSMASCHINE | [1985/18] | English: | CUTTING APPARATUS FOR WELDING MACHINE | [1985/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPE POUR MACHINE A SOUDER | [1985/18] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.1984 | Translation filed | 07.11.1984 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.1984 | Search fee paid | 07.11.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/18] | 03.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]SU865594 ; | [X]FR2347149 (BRITISH FEDERAL WELDER [GB]); | [A]FR2331415 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP]) | [Y] - SOVIET INVENTION ILLUSTRATED, week E28, 25th August 1982, abstract no. J 4332, P56, Derwent Publications Ltd., Section Mechanical, London, GB; & SU - A - 865 594 (ULYAN HEAVY MILLING), & SU865594 A 00000000 | International search | [Y]JPS5434956B ; | [Y]GB430847 (FRANZ EMIL OSKAR HOPPE) |