EP0139675 - COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1987 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.04.1989 [1989/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LKB-Produkter AB Box 305 S-161 26 Bromma / SE | For all designated states WALLAC OY P.O. Box 10 20101 Turku / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | For all designated states LKB-Produkter AB Box 305 S-161 26 Bromma / SE | ||
For all designated states WALLAC OY P.O. Box 10 SF-20101 Turku / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKOLA, Heikki Ruistie 6 B 37 SF-20720 Turku 72 / FI | 02 /
MUKKALA, Veli-Matti Jaakkimank. 7 A 16 SF-20740 Turku 74 / FI | 03 /
HEMMILÄ, Ilkka Paljaspää 6 A 1 SF-20610 Turku 61 / FI | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | Johansson, Lars E. LKB-Produkter AB Box 305 S-161 26 Bromma / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | Johansson, Lars E. LKB-Produkter AB Box 305 S-161 26 Bromma / SE | Application number, filing date | 84901128.3 | 13.03.1984 | [1985/19] | WO1984SE00089 | Priority number, date | SE19830001395 | 15.03.1983 Original published format: SE 8301395 | [1985/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8403698 | Date: | 27.09.1984 | [1984/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0139675 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0139675 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | C07C161/04, C07C101/26, C07F9/141, C07F9/65 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
G01N33/533 (EP,SE,US);
C07C229/16 (SE);
C07F9/3817 (EP,US);
G01N2458/40 (EP,US);
Y10S435/968 (EP,US);
Y10T436/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1985/19] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG | [1985/19] | English: | COMPOUND | [1985/19] | French: | COMPOSE | [1985/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.1984 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/19] | 09.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 31.01.1987 | [1989/17] | Cited in | International search | GB723316 [ ] (FREDERICK CHARLES BERSWORTH); | DE2015022 [ ]; | DE2233273 [ ] (MONSANTO CO); | DE2150994 [ ] (BASF AG); | FR2196992 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | DE2319047 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | DE2357278 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | DE2611813 [ ] (MONSANTO CO); | US3994966 [ ] (SUNDBERG MICHAEL W, et al); | DE2751943 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG); | DE2851898 [ ] (MONTEDISON SPA); | DE2918842 [ ] (REXOLIN CHEM AB); | EP0071564 [ ] (SCHERING AG [DE]); | US4374120 [ ] (SOINI ERKKI [FI], et al) |