EP0138890 - INSTALLATION FOR THE TREATMENT OF COMBUSTION GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.1987 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1987 [1987/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOIDL, Leonhard Hochfügener Strasse 258 A-6263 Fügen / AT | [1985/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/18] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul, et al Patentanwälte Torggler und Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556 6021 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/18] | Torggler, Paul, Dr., et al Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 84901176.2 | 14.03.1984 | [1985/18] | WO1984AT00012 | Priority number, date | AT19830001167 | 01.04.1983 Original published format: AT 116783 | [1985/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8403843 | Date: | 11.10.1984 | [1984/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0138890 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0138890 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/49] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B01D47/02 | [1985/18] | CPC: |
B01D47/027 (EP,US);
B01D47/06 (EP,US);
B01D53/34 (EP,US);
Y10S261/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/18] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VERBRENNUNGSGASEN | [1985/18] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR THE TREATMENT OF COMBUSTION GASES | [1985/18] | French: | INSTALLATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES GAZ DE COMBUSTION | [1985/18] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.1984 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/18] | 21.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | AU466194 [ ]; | GB1024169 [ ] (WELLMAN INCANDESCENT FURN CO); | US3585786 [ ] (HARDISON LESLIE C) |