EP0144432 - MEMORY READOUT CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.1993 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | ||
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAKIBARA, Shinsuke Mezon-Izumi 101 1-23-3, Higashi Izumi Komae-shi Tokyo 201 / JP | 02 /
TACHIBANA, Mitsuo Fuji-Haimu 202 3-23-1, Shinmei Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | [1985/25] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84901404.8 | 30.03.1984 | [1985/25] | WO1984JP00154 | Priority number, date | JP19830056472 | 31.03.1983 Original published format: JP 5647283 | [1985/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8403990 | Date: | 11.10.1984 | [1984/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0144432 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, G06F13/28, G05B19/405 | [1988/28] | CPC: |
G05B19/408 (EP);
G06F12/08 (EP);
G06F13/28 (EP);
G06F5/065 (EP);
G05B2219/35373 (EP);
G05B2219/36107 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/25] | G11C9/06, G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/25] | Title | German: | SPEICHERLESESTEUERSYSTEM | [1985/25] | English: | MEMORY READOUT CONTROL SYSTEM | [1985/25] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE LECTURE EN MEMOIRE | [1985/25] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1984 | Translation filed | 19.12.1984 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1984 | Search fee paid | 19.12.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/25] | 15.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/12] | 29.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP5313325 ; | [Y]EP0030981 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 49 (E-78)[837], 6. April 1978; & JP-A-53 13 325 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 02-06-1978, & JP5313325 A 00000000 | [A] - ELECTRONICS INTERNATIONAL, vol. 56, no. 16, 11th August 1983, pages 121-125, New York, US; W. BOENING et al.: "Multichannel DMA controller transfers 8 megabytes a second" | International search | [X]JPS5313325 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPS5750380 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |