EP0138962 - NMR IMAGING SYSTEM USING FIELD COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1991 [1991/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Macovski, Albert 2505 Alpine Road Menlo Park California 94025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/18] | For all designated states Macovski, Albert 2505 Alpine Road Menlo Park California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/18] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1988/23] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | ||
Former [1985/18] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 84901509.4 | 16.03.1984 | [1985/18] | WO1984US00395 | Priority number, date | US19830476474 | 18.03.1983 Original published format: US 476474 | [1985/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8403773 | Date: | 27.09.1984 | [1984/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0138962 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0138962 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N24/08, G01R33/24, A61B5/05 | [1990/19] | CPC: |
G01R33/58 (EP,US);
G01R33/56563 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/18] | G01R33/08, A61B5/05 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/18] | Title | German: | BILDSYSTEM MIT NUKLEARMAGNETISCHER RESONANZ UNTER VERWENDUNG VON FELDAUSGLEICH | [1985/18] | English: | NMR IMAGING SYSTEM USING FIELD COMPENSATION | [1985/18] | French: | SYSTEME DE MISE EN IMAGE A RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE NUCLEAIRE (NMR) UTILISANT UNE COMPENSATION DE CHAMP | [1985/18] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1984 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1984 | Search fee paid | 05.11.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/18] | 17.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.05.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5766346 ; | [Y]US3873909 (ERNST RICHARD R); | [A]GB2027208 (EMI LTD); | [Y]GB2037996 (EMI LTD); | [A]EP0055058 (PICKER INT LTD [GB]) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 145 (P-132)[1023], 4th August 1982; & JP-A-57 66 346 (SANYO DENKI K.K.) 22-04-1982, & JP5766346 A 00000000 | International search | [X]US4329646 (TSUDA MUNETAKA); | [YP]US4417209 (HOUNSFIELD GODFREY N [GB]); | [YP]US4418316 (YOUNG IAN R [GB], et al); | [AP]US4425547 (SUGIMOTO HIROSHI [JP]) |