Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
21.09.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.1987 [1987/46] |
22.12.1986 | First examination report | |
23.01.1986 | Change - representative | published on 12.03.1986 [1986/11] |
11.01.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.02.1986 [1986/09] |
11.01.1986 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.02.1986 [1986/09] |