EP0172170 - REFRACTORY HARD METAL CONTAINING PLATES FOR ALUMINUM CELL CATHODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH ALUMINUM CORPORATION 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda Maryland 20817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH ALUMINUM CORPORATION 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda Maryland 20817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOXALL, Larry, George 1210 White Mills Road Baltimore, MD 21228 / US | [1986/09] | Representative(s) | Crisp, David Norman, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | Crisp, David Norman, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1986/09] | Crisp, David Norman D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 84901885.8 | 19.04.1984 | [1986/09] | WO1984US00603 | Priority number, date | US19840576835 | 03.02.1984 Original published format: US 576835 | [1986/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8503532 | Date: | 15.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0172170 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/08, C04B35/58 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
C25C3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/09] | Title | German: | AUS FEUERFESTEM HARTMETALL BESTEHENDE PLATTE FÜR ALUMINIUMZELLEN-KATHODEN | [1986/09] | English: | REFRACTORY HARD METAL CONTAINING PLATES FOR ALUMINUM CELL CATHODES | [1986/09] | French: | PLAQUES CONTENANT UN METAL DUR REFRACTAIRE POUR DES CATHODES DE CELLULES DESTINEES A LA FABRICATION D'ALUMINIUM | [1986/09] | File destroyed: | 03.06.1993 | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1985 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/09] | 22.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/46] | 15.06.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | WO8300338 [ ]; | WO8300325 [ ]; | WO8400566 [ ] |