EP0141853 - METHOD FOR REDUCING THE INCIDENCE OF WIRE BREAKAGE IN ORTHOPAEDIC SURGERY AND THE LIKE AND TOOLS FOR EFFECTING SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.1985 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.1986 [1986/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLEIN, Harvey A. 1000 East 19th Street Brooklyn, NY 11230 / US | [1985/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/21] | Application number, filing date | 84902151.4 | 03.05.1984 | [1985/21] | WO1984US00690 | Priority number, date | US19830491244 | 03.05.1983 Original published format: US 491244 | [1985/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8404241 | Date: | 08.11.1984 | [1984/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0141853 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/21] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/04, A61F17/00, B23B41/00, B23B51/00 | [1985/21] | CPC: |
A61B17/8861 (EP,US);
B23B51/00 (EP,US);
Y10T408/906 (EP,US);
Y10T408/9065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERMÄSSIGUNG DER FOLGE EINES DRAHTBRUCHS BEI ORTHOPÄDISCHER CHIRURGIE UND DERGLEICHEN SOWIE WERKZEUGE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | [1985/21] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING THE INCIDENCE OF WIRE BREAKAGE IN ORTHOPAEDIC SURGERY AND THE LIKE AND TOOLS FOR EFFECTING SAID METHOD | [1985/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE REDUCTION DE L'INCIDENCE D'UNE RUPTURE DE FIL EN CHIRURGIE ORTHOPEDIQUE ET ANALOGUE ET OUTILS PERMETTANT D'EXECUTER CE PROCEDE | [1985/21] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 11.06.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/03] | 08.07.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1986/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.02.1985 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US252704 ; | [A]US370484 ; | [A]GB191325718 (BRITTON SAMUEL STONEHOUSE); | [A]US1471866 (SIMPSON ALBERT E); | [A]US2264922 (HOOSER OSCAR H VAN); | [A]US2705515 (BROOKS WALKER); | [A]US4330229 (CROYDON FREDERIC G) |