EP0148863 - POLARIZATION-INSENSITIVE, EVANESCENT-WAVE, FUSED COUPLER WITH MINIMAL ENVIRONMENTAL SENSITIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | Revocation of patent | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOULD INC. 35129 Curtis Boulevard Eastlake, Ohio 44095 / US | [1992/29] |
Former [1985/30] | For all designated states GOULD INC. 10 Gould Center Rolling Meadows, IL 60008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOWE, David, W. 930 Ridgefield Lane Buffalo Grove, IL 60090 / US | 02 /
KOPERA, Paul, M. 3219 Sunset Franklin Park, IL 60131 / US | [1985/30] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 84902308.0 | 25.05.1984 | [1985/30] | WO1984US00820 | Priority number, date | US19830498436 | 26.05.1983 Original published format: US 498436 | [1985/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8404822 | Date: | 06.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0148863 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0148863 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.12.1984 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/245, G02B6/28 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
G02B6/245 (EP);
G02B6/2835 (EP);
G02B6/2843 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/30] | G02B5/172, G02B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/30] | Title | German: | POLARISATIONSUNEMPFINDLICHER SCHMELZKOPPLER MIT EVANESCIERENDER WELLE UND MINIMALER UMWELTEMPFINDLICHKEIT | [1985/30] | English: | POLARIZATION-INSENSITIVE, EVANESCENT-WAVE, FUSED COUPLER WITH MINIMAL ENVIRONMENTAL SENSITIVITY | [1985/30] | French: | COUPLEUR FUSIONNE INSENSIBLE A LA POLARISATION, A ONDE EVANESCENTE ET PRESENTANT UNE SENSIBILITE MINIME A L'ENVIRONNEMENT | [1985/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1985 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1985 | Search fee paid | 04.02.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/30] | 15.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.09.1993
18.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE AOFR Pty Ltd 9 Lyell Street Fyshwick, Australian Capital Territory, 2609 / AU Opponent's representative Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner, et al, et al Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.09.1993
18.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE AOFR Pty Ltd 9 Lyell Street Fyshwick, Australian Capital Territory, 2609 / AU Opponent's representative Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner, et al, et al Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | 23.11.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.03.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.04.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.03.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/38] | 24.04.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4054366 (BARNOSKI MICHAEL K, et al); | [X]JPS5391752 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]GB2038017 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [A]US4264126 (SHEEM SANG K); | [X]US4315666 (HICKS JR JOHN W); | [A]US4336047 (PAVLOPOULOS THEODORE G, et al); | [A]US4354760 (SCHIFFNER GERHARD); | [X]EP0074789 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]); | [XP]US4387954 (BEASLEY J DONALD) | [X] - Electronics Letters, issued 27 March 1980, R.A. BERGH et al., Single-Mode Fiber Optic Directional Coupler, pages 260-261 | [A] - IEEE Journal of Quantum Electronics, Vol. QE-17, No. 6, issued June 1981, D.C. TRAN et al., Single-Mode Fiber Directional Couplers Fabricated by Twist-Etching Techniques (Stabilization), pages 988-991 | [A] - Optics Letters, Vol. 6, No. 7, issued July 1981, B.S. KAWASAKI et al., Biconicaltaper Single-Mode Fiber Coupler, pages 327-328 | [AP] - Optics Letters, Vol. 8, No. 10, issued October 1983, B.K. NAYER et al., Monomode-Polalization-Maintaining Fiber Directional Coupler, pages 543-545 | Examination | EP0069054 | EP0047960 | EP0093460 | - Electronics Letters, vol. 17, no. 6, 19 March 1981, pp 243-244 | - Electronics Letters, vol. 18, no. 22, 28 October 1982, pp 962-964 |