EP0148236 - FLEXIBLE WAVEGUIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GABRIEL MICROWAVE LIMITED Battle Road Heathfield Newton Abbot Devon TQ12 6XU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states GABRIEL MICROWAVE LIMITED Battle Road Heathfield Newton Abbot Devon TQ12 6XU / GB | ||
Former [1985/29] | For all designated states GABRIEL MICROWAVE SYSTEMS LIMITED Battle Road Heathfield Newton Abbot Devon TQ12 6XU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STIDWELL, Alan, George Higher Lake Farm Woodland Ashburton Devon TQ13 7LL / GB | [1985/29] | Representative(s) | Abbott, David John, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | Abbott, David John, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1985/29] | Stephens, Michael John M.J. Stephens & Co. 46 Tavistock Place Plymouth PL4 8AX / GB | Application number, filing date | 84902605.9 | 05.07.1984 | [1985/29] | WO1984GB00241 | Priority number, date | GB19830018144 | 05.07.1983 Original published format: GB 8318144 | [1985/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8500471 | Date: | 31.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0148236 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0148236 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01P3/14 | [1985/29] | CPC: |
H01P3/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/29] | Title | German: | BIEGSAME HOHLLEITER | [1985/29] | English: | FLEXIBLE WAVEGUIDES | [1985/29] | French: | GUIDES D'ONDES FLEXIBLES | [1985/29] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.1985 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/38] | 05.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.09.1987 | 31.07.1989 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   19.01.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 24.09.1985 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | 03.11.1986 | Resumption of proceedings | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.03.1990 | BE | 28.03.1990 | CH | 28.03.1990 | LI | 28.03.1990 | NL | 28.03.1990 | LU | 31.07.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/17] | AT | 28.03.1990 | |
BE | 28.03.1990 | ||
CH | 28.03.1990 | ||
LI | 28.03.1990 | ||
NL | 28.03.1990 | ||
Former [1990/46] | CH | 28.03.1990 | |
LI | 28.03.1990 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP5226478 ; | DE1048970 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | GB1160942 [ ] (TELEFUNKEN PATENT [DE]); | FR2176089 [ ] (ANDREW CORP [US]); | US2556187 [ ] (DAVID INGALLS); | US3016503 [ ] (PIERCE JOHN R); | US3201723 [ ] (HELMUT MARTIN, et al); | US3345590 [ ] (KRANK WOLFGANG, et al); | US3372352 [ ] (WOLFGANG KRANK, et al) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 1, No. 92, 25 August 1977 & JP, A, 52-26478 (Nippon Denshin Denwa Kosha), & JP5226478 A 19770825 |