EP0148914 - DOSE MEASURING DEVICE/MIXER OF FUEL, AIR AND WATER FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.1987 [1987/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOPES, Joaquim Antonio Fernandes Av. Sao Luiz, 268 - 14, andar, Apto. 14/A 01045 Sao Paulo-SP / BR | [1985/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/30] | Representative(s) | Modrie, Guy, et al Cabinet Vigneron Avenue G. De Longueville, 22 Bte 7-14 1150 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | Modrie, Guy, et al Cabinet Vigneron Avenue G. De Longueville, 22 Bte 7-14 B-1150 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1985/30] | Modrie, Guy Cabinet Vigneron Avenue G. De Longueville, 22 Bte 7-14 B-1150 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 84902695.0 | 09.07.1984 | [1985/30] | WO1984BR00004 | Priority number, date | BR19838303760 | 11.07.1983 Original published format: BR 8303760 | [1985/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8500411 | Date: | 31.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0148914 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.01.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/02 | [1985/30] | CPC: |
F02M17/16 (EP);
F02M25/022 (KR);
F02M25/0225 (EP);
F02M25/035 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR [1985/30] | Title | German: | DOSIER-/ UND MISCHVORRICHTUNG FÜR BRENNSTOFF, LUFT UND WASSER FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOREN | [1985/30] | English: | DOSE MEASURING DEVICE/MIXER OF FUEL, AIR AND WATER FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES | [1985/30] | French: | DOSEUR/MELANGEUR DE CARBURANT, AIR ET EAU POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1985/30] | File destroyed: | 03.06.1993 | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.1985 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.1985 | Search fee paid | 06.03.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/41] | 05.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/28] | 12.02.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1986 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No relevant documents have been disclosed | International search | [A]GB714015 (DAVID SABETAY); | [A]US3761062 (KING A); | [X]US4005683 (WHITT RAYMOND DOUGLAS); | [A]US4059082 (MCCAULEY ROGER A); | [A]US4133847 (FEUERMAN ARNOLD I); | [A]US4259021 (GOUDY JR PAUL R); | [A]US4324209 (GERRY MARTIN E) |