EP0147461 - 11-HALOGENE-PROSTANE DERIVATIVES, PROCESS FOR OBTAINING THEM AND UTILIZATION THEREOF AS DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1992 [1992/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VORBRÜGGEN, Helmut Wilkestr. 7 D-1000 Berlin 27 / DE | 02 /
SCHWARZ, Norbert Stubenrauchstr. 31 D-1000 Berlin 41 / DE | 03 /
LOGE, Olaf Bekassinenweg 37 D-1000 Berlin 27 / DE | 04 /
STÜRZEBECHER, Claus-Steffen Kuckucksweg 6 D-1000 Berlin 33 / DE | 05 /
ELGER, Walter Schorlemer Allee 12b D-1000 Berlin 33 / DE | [1985/28] | Application number, filing date | 84902782.6 | 05.07.1984 | [1985/28] | WO1984DE00139 | Priority number, date | DE19833325175 | 08.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3325175 | [1985/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8500367 | Date: | 31.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0147461 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0147461 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07C405/00, C07D317/20, C07D319/06, C07D263/14, C07D271/06, C07D493/08 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
C07C405/0016 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C405/00 (EP,US);
C07C405/0041 (EP,US);
C07D317/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/28] | C07C177/00, C07D317/20, C07D319/06, C07D263/14, C07D271/06, C07D493/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/28] | Title | German: | 11-HALOGEN-PROSTANDERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE ANWENDUNG ALS ARZNEIMITTEL | [1985/28] | English: | 11-HALOGENE-PROSTANE DERIVATIVES, PROCESS FOR OBTAINING THEM AND UTILIZATION THEREOF AS DRUGS | [1985/28] | French: | DERIVES DE 11-HALOGENE-PROSTANE, LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME MEDICAMENTS | [1985/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.1985 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/28] | 02.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/53] | Request for further processing for: | 08.02.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.03.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - Prostaglandins, Vol. 16, No. 1, July 1978, Los Altos, Cal. (US), C.E. ARRONIZ et al.: "Synthesis of Ring Halogenated Prostaglandins (1)", pages 47-60, see pages 47, 52-59 (cited in the application) | [X] - Chemistry, Biochemistry, and Pharmacological Activity of Prostanoids, published by S.M. Roberts and F. Scheinmann, Oxford (GB), J.M. MUCHOWSKI: "Synthetis and Bronchial Dilator Activity of some Novel Prostaglandin Analogues (1)", pages 39-60, see pages 54, 55, 56, 57 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 92, No. 5, 4 February 1980, Columbus, Ohio (US), V.V. BEZUGLOV et al. "Synthesis of Fluoro Prostaglandins I.11-Fluoro and 15-Fluoro Prostaglandins", see page 734, Abstract 41401a, Bioorg. Khim. 1979, 5(10) 1531-6 (Russ.) | Examination | - Chemistry, Biochemistry, and Pharmacological Activity of Prostanoids, herausgegeben von S.M. Roberts und F. Scheinmann, Oxford, GB; J.M. MUCHOWSKI: "Synthesis and Bronchial Dilator Activity of Some Novel Prostaglandin Analogues (1)", Seiten 39-60, siehe Seiten 54-57 | - Chemical Abstracts, Band 92, Nr. 5, 4. Februar 1980, Columbus, Ohio, US; V. V: BEZUGLOV et al: "Synthesis of fluoroprostaglandins. I.11-Fluoro and 15-fluoro prostaglandins", siehe S. 734, Zusammenfassung Nr. 41402a, Bioorg. Khim., 1979, 5(10), 1531-6 (Russ) |