EP0193525 - SHAFT-MOUNTED SNAP LOCK ASSEMBLY AND TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN SNAPNUT ASSOCIATES 107 Weeks Road East Williston, NY 11596 / US | [1986/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RESNICOW, Herbert, E. 107 Weeks Road East Williston, NY 11596 / US | [1986/37] | Representative(s) | Kopacz, William James Law Offices Kopacz 129 Boulevard Saint-Germain 75006 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/37] | Kopacz, William James 83, Avenue Foch F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84903138.0 | 08.08.1984 | [1986/37] | WO1984US01245 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601266 | Date: | 27.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0193525 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16B17/00, F16B19/00, F16B33/02, F16B37/08, F16B37/10, F16B39/02, F16B43/00, F16G11/00, F16B21/06 | [1986/37] | CPC: |
F16D1/06 (EP,US);
B25B27/14 (EP,US);
B25B7/22 (EP,US);
F16B21/16 (EP,US);
F16B21/20 (EP,US);
F16B37/0885 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/37] | Title | German: | AUF EINER WELLE MONTIERTER SCHNAPPVERSCHLUSS UND WERKZEUG DAFÜR | [1986/37] | English: | SHAFT-MOUNTED SNAP LOCK ASSEMBLY AND TOOL | [1986/37] | French: | ENSEMBLE A VERROUILLAGE PAR PRESSION MONTE SUR ARBRE ET SON OUTIL | [1986/37] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.1986 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1986 | Search fee paid | 24.03.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 06.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/19] | 06.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1991/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2676509 (HENRY GRAHAM JOHN); | [A]US4078470 (ZERANICK JR PAUL S, et al); | [A]DE3202433 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]); | [E]US4556352 (RESNICOW HERBERT [US]) | International search | [Y]AU255354B ; | [A]AT723028B ; | [Y]US309784 ; | [A]US370168 ; | [A]US758549 (MELIUS CHARLES H [US]); | [A]US918078 (MCCAFFREY JOHN [US]); | [Y]US1082993 (BEATTIE RICHARD LANDGRIGE [CA]); | [A]US1368525 (PARKS STEPHEN E); | [Y]US1405342 (SHAFFER GEORGE F); | [A]US1492561 (GABRIEL CHARLES R); | [Y]US1721100 (ARMSTRONG WILLIAM T); | [Y]US2490728 (COX DUNCAN B); | [A]FR975991 (EXPORTATION ET D IMP ATION DE); | [A]US2719025 (STONE ALBERT L); | [Y]FR1206230 ; | [Y]US3038366 (HINDMAN ROY G); | [A]DE1144542 (RUDI NOWAK, et al); | [A]US3079824 (SCHOTT ARTHUR K); | [A]US3460300 (HOWLETT JAMES W); | [A]US3495496 (KEIM MELVILLE); | [Y]CA898794 (ANTHES IMP LTD); | [A]US3734547 (KOJIMA N); | [A]US3799026 (SELCH H); | [A]US3807885 (COSKI W); | [A]GB1375773 ; | [A]US4166708 (LAFFERTY GARY S [US]); | [A]US4226164 (CARTER ALTON L); | [X]US4274323 (RESNICOW HERBERT) |