EP0157789 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO RECTIFIER CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1985/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEDERICO, Joseph 16 Fickler Place Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922 / US | 02 /
WAABEN, Sigurd, Gunther 3461 Lawrenceville Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [1985/42] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies Inc., 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 84903155.4 | 20.08.1984 | [1985/42] | WO1984US01322 | Priority number, date | US19830528899 | 02.09.1983 Original published format: US 528899 | [1985/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8501161 | Date: | 14.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0157789 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0157789 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/217, G01R19/22 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
H02M7/2173 (EP,US);
G01R19/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1985/42] | Title | German: | GLEICHRICHTERSCHALTUNGEN | [1985/42] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO RECTIFIER CIRCUITS | [1985/42] | French: | AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES A DES CIRCUITS REDRESSEURS | [1985/42] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1985 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 03.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3354380 [ ] (FLY GALE S, et al); | DE2801684 [ ] (SIEMENS AG) |