EP0154639 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS HAVING APPETITE REDUCING ACTIVITY AND A PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1991 [1991/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BALKANYI, Iván Tündérlaki u. 6 H-1016 Budapest / HU | For all designated states SZEBENI, Rudolf 5, Ybl Miklos tér H-1013 Budapest / HU | For all designated states HADI, Ferenc Dozsa György u. 13 H-2626 Nagymaros / HU | For all designated states MARSO, Miklos Arpad fejedelem u. 55/a H-1036 Budapest / HU | For all designated states KERI, Eva Kazinczy u. 7 II 5 H-1075 Budapest / HU | For all designated states KÖSZEGI, Béla 5, Szigligeti utca H-1193 Budapest / HU | [1989/52] |
Former [1985/38] | For all designated states BALKANYI, Iván Tündérlaki u. 6 H-1016 Budapest / HU | ||
For all designated states SZEBENI, Rudolf 5, Ybl Miklos tér H-1013 Budapest / HU | |||
For all designated states HADI, Ferenc Dozsa György u. 13 H-2626 Nagymaros / HU | |||
For all designated states MARSO, Miklos Arpad fejedelem u. 55/a H-1036 Budapest / HU | |||
For all designated states KERI, Eva Kazinczy u. 7 II 5 H-1075 Budapest / HU | |||
For all designated states KÖSZEGI, Béla Corvin Körut 52 H-1192 Budapest / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/38] | Representative(s) | Koch, Gustave, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | Koch, Gustave, et al Cabinet PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1985/38] | Koch, Gustave Cabinet PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 84903191.9 | 24.08.1984 | [1985/38] | WO1984HU00042 | Priority number, date | HU19830002993 | 26.08.1983 Original published format: HU 299383 | [1985/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8500970 | Date: | 14.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0154639 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0154639 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 14.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/485 | [1985/38] | CPC: |
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1985/38] | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT HUNGERSTILLENDER WIRKUNG UND DEREN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1985/38] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS HAVING APPETITE REDUCING ACTIVITY AND A PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | [1985/38] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES AYANT UNE ACTIVITE DE REDUCTION DE L'APPETIT, ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1985/38] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1985 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/38] | 13.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0005636 (DU PONT [US]); | [X]DE2923955 (TECNOFARMACI SPA); | [X]US4267182 (HOLADAY JOHN W, et al); | [A]WO8203768 (UNIV KENTUCKY [US]) | [Y] - S.G. Holtzman 'Life Sciences', volume 16, published 1975, by Pergamon Press (Oxford, New York, Braunschweig), see pages 1465-1470, especially page 1465, second passage, page 1466, sixth passage, page 1467, last passage, page 1468, fig 1, fourth passage, last passage of the discussion. | Examination | - Dictionary of Organic Compounds, 5th. Edition, vol. 4, page 4137 | - Life Sciences, vol 16, 1465-1470 | - Clinical pharmacology and therapeutics, 20(30), (1976), 315-328 | - Journal of Biol. Chem. 1979, 2446-2449 |