EP0187751 - POWDER MIXTURE FREE OF SEGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.1989 [1989/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Höganäs AB Box 501 S-263 01 Höganäs / SE | [1986/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGSTRÖM, Ulf, Fredrik, Ivar Jacoby väg 8 S-263 00 Höganäs / SE | [1986/30] | Representative(s) | Burman, Tore, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/30] | Burman, Tore, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 S-104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 84903300.6 | 05.09.1984 | [1986/30] | WO1984SE00290 | Priority number, date | SE19830004832 | 09.09.1983 Original published format: SE 8304832 | [1986/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8501230 | Date: | 28.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0187751 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0187751 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/00, C22C33/02 | [1986/30] | CPC: |
C22C33/0271 (EP,SE,US);
B22F1/10 (EP,SE,US);
B22F1/148 (EP,SE,US);
C22C33/0214 (EP,SE,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1986/30] | Title | German: | TRENNUNGSFREIES PULVERGEMISCH | [1986/30] | English: | POWDER MIXTURE FREE OF SEGREGATION | [1986/30] | French: | MELANGE DE POUDRE EXEMPT DE SEGREGATION | [1986/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.1986 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1985 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 20.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 28.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 07.09.1988 | [1989/24] | Cited in | International search | US2514312 [ ] (CHRIST ROBERT E); | US3583864 [ ] (ADLER ARTHUR); | SE353740 [ ] (HOEGANAES AB); | US4090868 [ ] (TENGZELIUS JAN ROBERT, et al); | US4093449 [ ] (SVENSSON LARS-ERIK, et al); | EP0029389 [ ] (CREUSOT LOIRE [FR]); | DE3132277 [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | SE427434 [ ] (HOEGANAES AB [SE]) | [A] - Christa Sauer: Mischungs- und Entmischungsprobleme bei Metallpulvern. I: Neue Hutte 17Jg Heft 6 June 1972 | Examination | - Ch. SAuer: "Mischungs- und Entmischungsprobleme bei Metallpulvern. I: Neue Hütte 17 Jg., Heft 6 June 1972, pp. 358-363, II: Neue Hütte 18 Jg Heft 4 April 1973, pp. 231-234, III: Neue Hütte 18 Jg Heft 10 October 1973, pp. 595-598 |